Financial history CARERS SUPPORT MERTON

Charity number: 1085761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £538.43k £541.84k £546.78k £598.82k £503.04k
Total expenditure £536.66k £482.21k £533.67k £595.66k £621.64k
Income from government contracts N/A £75.00k £75.00k £75.00k £75.00k
Income from government grants £375.94k £388.18k £452.91k £520.33k £385.96k
Income - Donations and legacies £27.65k £11.09k £5.35k £1.49k £3.69k
Income - Other trading activities £5.26k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £504.70k £530.01k £541.13k £595.33k £492.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £821 £383 £295 £2.00k £6.50k
Income - Other £0 £364 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £534.35k £460.02k £533.67k £595.66k £621.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.31k £22.19k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.38k £1.38k £1.43k £1.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0