Financial history THE COLTSTAPLE TRUST

Charity number: 1085500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £702.17k £743.25k £912.09k £955.84k £979.07k
Total expenditure £400.02k £504.76k £750.21k £850.21k £975.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £702.17k £742.92k £912.09k £955.84k £977.12k
Income - Other £0 £330 £0 £0 £1.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £400.00k £504.76k £750.21k £850.21k £975.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.76k £206 £206 £287
Expenditure - Grants institution £400.00k £500.00k £750.00k £850.00k £975.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £18 £0 £0 £0 £0