Financial history CONGO ACTION

Charity number: 1088833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.30k £12.58k £21.16k £18.84k £12.09k
Total expenditure £7.49k £9.53k £13.98k £20.12k £10.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A