Financial history ALSTON GOODS SHED TRUST

Charity number: 1089080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/08/2013 21/08/2021 21/08/2022 21/08/2023 21/08/2024
Total gross income £5.90k £10.15k £1.60k £4.82k £3.64k
Total expenditure £5.35k £5.30k £3.14k £6.74k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.15k N/A N/A N/A