ALSTON GOODS SHED TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help educate the general public through a transport and heritage museum depicting th history of Alston Moor and the surrounding district through photographs, artefacts, general memorabilia and vintage vehicles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 26 October 2001: Standard registration
- HUB OF THE NORTH PENNINES MUSEUM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Brian Rogers | Chair | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Alan Haldon | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Sheila Wyatt | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
ALAN GREEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/08/2013 | 21/08/2021 | 21/08/2022 | 21/08/2023 | 21/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £10.15k | £1.60k | £4.82k | £3.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35k | £5.30k | £3.14k | £6.74k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 August 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 August 2023 | 23 March 2025 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 August 2022 | 23 March 2025 | 641 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 August 2021 | 23 March 2025 | 1006 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM OR HERITAGE CENTRE TO REFLECT THE AGRICULTURAL, INDUSTRIAL, TRANSPORT AND SOCIAL HERITAGE OF ALSTON MOOR AND THE VALLEY OF THE SOUTH TYNE.
Area of benefit
ALSTON MOOR AND THE VALLEY OF THE SOUTH TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stone Leigh
Garrigill Road
ALSTON
Cumbria
CA9 3UD
- Phone:
- 07841418100
- Email:
- sheilahodgson@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window