THE ASSOCIATION OF NIGERIAN COMMUNITY IN LBWF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission of NICOWF is to provide channels through which social, political & economic issues affecting Nigerians can be addressed. We aim to be a prominent source of information, to give advice & guidance to Nigerians in our Borough & vicinity and draw strength from global diversity, resources & experience to promote innovative solutions & encourage global responsibility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 09 January 2002: Standard registration
- NIGERIAN COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REGINALD HANOTU | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ADEBOWALE ADEWUMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTOR ORHIERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FABIAN UKAEGBU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOLA FANIKU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.00k | £1.70k | £5.35k | £4.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £1.50k | £1.56k | £4.42k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 October 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST AUGUST 1999, AS AMENDED 3RD NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WALTHAM FOREST, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE OF NIGERIAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUTHS (2) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
428 Lea Bridge Road
Leyton
LONDON
E10 7DY
- Phone:
- 07845432401
- Email:
- INFO@NICOWF.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window