Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD - WEST BROMWICH (DARTMOUTH PARK)

Charity number: 1085588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2007 29 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2006 13 March 2007 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2004 02 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2004 Not Required