Accounts and annual returns JIGSAW AT ST JOHN'S

Charity number: 1088132
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late