Financial history WANDSWORTH ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1088847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.14k £20.69k £21.35k £26.65k £30.24k
Total expenditure £27.55k £18.04k £20.84k £24.74k £29.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.69k £21.35k £22.69k £30.24k