WANDSWORTH ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Project offers a lunch and social club for women in the Wandsworth Borough for two days a week offering a range of educational, social activities for older women having no other outlet, aim to combat loneliness by providing comfortable environment, give practical support for benefits, housing issues and any other type of individual help required. The Project employs two part time workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,235 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 October 2001: Standard registration
- ASIAN ELDERLY PROJECT (Working name)
- ASRA (Working name)
- WANDSWORTH ASIAN WOMENS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Riffat Butt | Chair | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Saleema Habib | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BUSHRA KHAN | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hammidah Mannan | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMTUL HAFEEZ HAQ | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NAZLEE BUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SADQA NASIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.14k | £20.69k | £21.35k | £26.65k | £30.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.55k | £18.04k | £20.84k | £24.74k | £29.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.69k | £21.35k | £22.69k | £30.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 SEPTEMBER, 2001.
Charitable objects
PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ASIAN WOMEN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wandsworth Asian Women Association
Mantle Court
Mapleton Road
LONDON
SW18 4AU
- Phone:
- 020 8875 9466
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window