DONCASTER AMATEUR PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Opportunities for everyone to access participation in drama and theatre arts both performances and backstage work. Passing on theatre based skills to new members and young people by experienced members. Opportunities for general public and schools and young peoples groups to access live theatre performances in Doncaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Doncaster
Governance
- 18 December 2001: Standard registration
- THE REP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Woffenden | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Lowndes-Sanderson | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wainwright | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MCQUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTINE GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE MARY MCKEOWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHERINE WOFFENDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65k | £66 | £2.58k | £7.03k | £4.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78k | £197 | £3.55k | £7.42k | £7.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 30 AUGUST 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART BY THE SHARING OF EXPERTISE BOTH WITHIN THE MEMBERSHIP AND BY ASSOCIATION WITH OTHER RELATED AGENCIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 SANDROCK DRIVE
DONCASTER
DN4 6DT
- Phone:
- 01302532585
- Email:
- katem1918@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window