Financial history THE SIR STANLEY MATTHEWS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1092803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £81.32k £59.59k £29.67k £40.28k £29.84k
Total expenditure £61.95k £63.47k £41.97k £40.00k £40.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A