Trustees THE SIR STANLEY MATTHEWS FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 1092803

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Harbinson | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanley John Matthews | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan David Baxter | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jean Davis | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hilton Bray | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Frances Gough | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert GOUGH | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.