CHRISTIAN CAUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the charity are to: Financially support Christian Charities and/or Christian Organisations whose work focuses on housing and the homeless, feeding the hungry and/or the propogation of the Christian faith; To sponsor faith schools for the education of Christian Children; To provide direct aid to Christian individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Milton Keynes
- Colombia
- Cyprus
- India
- Italy
- Paraguay
- Ukraine
Governance
- 19 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE SIDERAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr DEMETRI SIDERAS | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELENI CONSTANTINOU | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LOUIS SIDERAS | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET SIDERAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RENOS SIDERAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.06k | £18.01k | £80.76k | £138.80k | £68.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.51k | £25.47k | £21.76k | £44.25k | £28.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 2001, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, PARTICULARLY THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN CHARITIES EXISTING TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANDERLEY
30 STRAIGHT MILE
AMPFIELD
ROMSEY
- Phone:
- 07973254356
- Email:
- georgesideras@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window