COKA (COMMUNITY OF KING ALFRED'S)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parents association supporting King Alfred's college through fund raising, small lottery and social events. All surpluses ultimately awarded as grants to King Alfred's college or other local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 March 2001: Standard registration
- KAPTA (Working name)
- KING ALFRED'S PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Smith Mr | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.65k | £12.94k | £10.17k | £12.94k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.53k | £24.29k | £8.30k | £47.53k | £12.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 May 2022 | 335 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 March 2021 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 2000 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
KING ALFRED'S COLLEGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Applegarth
Belmont
WANTAGE
OX12 9AS
- Phone:
- 01235 225700
- Email:
- jsmith@kaacademy.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window