MOUNT ZION-THE PRAYER MOUNTAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching the gospel of Jesus Christ, helping the needy in the local community and organisation of social activities for the youths in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 08 June 2001: Standard registration
- MOUNTAIN OF GLORY CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR CHARLES TAMAKLOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ritnatu Kwatiah | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Dhillon | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Otto | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raphael Dela Tamakloe | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL TAMAKLOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.11k | £160.26k | £166.42k | £161.23k | £137.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.57k | £125.43k | £129.41k | £144.01k | £146.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO FURTHER THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOUNT ZION THE PRAYER MOUNTAIN
EAST WING CASTLE HOUSE
DAWSON ROAD
MOUNT FARM
MILTON KEYNES
MK1 1QY
- Phone:
- 07745813669
- Email:
- cklt@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window