THE POTTERS BAR SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Potters Bar Society has been campaigning since 1961 on matters affecting the local enviroment and community. We scrutinise planning applications, oppose plans which would result in loss of amenities, and take action against the effect of noise and traffic and similar issues which might impact on the services and character of Potters Bar including both the town and the surrounding Green Belt.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christine Ann Fraser | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ARNOLD DAVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALASTAIR MATHESON MACLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58k | £294 | £1.13k | £1.28k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £564 | £1.32k | £1.09k | £859 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH MAY 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF CIVIC DESIGN (B) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC CONSCIOUSNESS AND APPRECIATION OF THE BEAUTY, CHARACTER AND HISTORY OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND ITS SURROUNDINGS (C) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FEATURES WHICH GO TO MAKE PLEASING AND CONVENIENT CONDITIONS IN WHICH TO WORK (D) TO CALL ATTENTION, WHERE DESIRABLE, TO ANY ACTIVITIES OR PROPOSALS AFFECTING, OR TENDING TO EFFECT, THE INTERESTS OF THE CITIZENS, AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE EXPRESSION OF OPINION THEREON (E) TO PURSUE THOSE ENDS BY SUCH MEANS AS MEETINGS, LECTURES, STUDY GROUPS, EXHIBITIONS, PUBLICATIONS, AND COMMUNICATIONS WITH OTHER BODIES.
Area of benefit
POTTERS BAR AND SOUTH MIMMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 LADBROOKE DRIVE
POTTERS BAR
EN6 1QR
- Phone:
- 01707653636
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window