Accounts and annual returns GEMK (GLOBAL EDUCATION, MILTON KEYNES)

Charity number: 1086858
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 27 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 21 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 21 September 2012 On Time