GEMK (GLOBAL EDUCATION, MILTON KEYNES)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GEMK provides training and support for local schools to increase understanding about 'global' issues around peace, justice, poverty and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 31 May 2001: Standard registration
- 24 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GEMK (Working name)
- THE MILTON KEYNES WORLD DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.63k | £48.20k | £34.17k | £5.67k | £59 | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.13k | £60.89k | £34.04k | £15.74k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 21 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 21 September 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3RD NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC VALUE RELATING TO THE WORLD PROBLEMS OF HUNGER DISEASE POVERTY AND IGNORANCE AND THE SOLUTIONS THEREOF AND TO THE ECONOMIC AND OTHER PROBLEMS OF DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND THEIR RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER COUNTRIES WHERE ECONOMIES ARE FURTHER ADVANCED OR DEVELOPED
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES BOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURING REGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window