Financial history BNOS TSFAS LTD

Charity Number: 1090858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £352.63k £466.02k £222.05k £215.00k £275.00k
Total expenditure £350.84k £512.67k £226.18k £207.00k £270.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A