Financial history RELATE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE

Charity number: 1086299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £230.21k £226.72k £187.76k £258.46k £107.68k
Total expenditure £244.27k £214.95k £220.45k £220.25k £194.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A