RELATE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relate Nottinghamshire provides the following services:- Relationship counselling for couples and individuals; Pysychosexual therapy, Family counselling; Young people counselling and relationship education and training courses. We deliver services at Relate premises and outposts, and in the community when funding is available for project work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Strutton | Chair | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Hardy | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Keyes | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Anne McEwen | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dunleavy | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Rodrigues | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.21k | £226.72k | £187.76k | £258.46k | £107.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.27k | £214.95k | £220.45k | £220.25k | £194.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
19 June 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 NOVEMBER 2003, 6 DECEMBER 2007 AND 24 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
4. 1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS 4. 2) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY - 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE, AND, 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS, 4.3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING, OR, 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT 4.5) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.6) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Enterprise Business Agency
6 Sherwood Rise
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 6JF
- Phone:
- 01159584278
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window