Governing document Koolesh Shah Family Foundation

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH MARCH 2001, AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 25TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 20 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED ON 20 AUG 1991 AS AMENDED ON 13 JAN 2020 as amended on 13 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES PARTICULARLY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.