Accounts and annual returns THE HUB PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1086904
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 15 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 29 October 2007 On Time