Financial history HAZON YESHAYA UK

Charity number: 1088738
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £156.46k £573.98k £561.94k £758.52k £1.46m
Total expenditure £169.40k £565.79k £561.63k £709.32k £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £573.01k £561.41k £757.15k £1.46m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £975 £526 £1.37k £19
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £563.98k £492.68k £548.81k £930.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.68k £2.04k £2.82k £4.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £563.98k £491.00k £546.00k £930.48k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0