KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD - MANCHESTER (GORTON)
Charity number: 1085970
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Manchester City
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 March 2001: Standard registration
- 02 March 2007: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 5 APRIL 1934 DEED OF DEDICATION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1949
Charitable objects
A RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD, TO BE PRESERVED IN PERPETUITY AS A MEMORIAL TO KING GEORGE V, UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF THE KING GEORGE'S FIELDS FOUNDATION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GORTON, MANCHESTER
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window