NETWORK FOR SURVIVING STALKING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inform - provide information about the problem of stalking to anyone concerned or interested. Educate - raise awareness and understanding to combat ignorance and misunderstanding. Campaign - ensure stalking is taken seriously by government, police and other criminal justice services, health services, media & general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2001: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 March 2020: Funds transferred to 802567 THE SUZY LAMPLUGH TRUST
- NSS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £11.23k | £11.45k | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12k | £9.22k | £10.54k | £6.08k | £776 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 July 2019 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 17 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG VICTIMS OF STALKING AND HARASSMENT, AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF STALKING AND HARASSMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window