Financial history WILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1086830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/03/2020 12/03/2021 12/03/2022 12/03/2023 12/03/2024
Total gross income £4.39k £2.35k £2.43k £2.43k £2.43k
Total expenditure £3.22k £2.85k £2.35k £3.53k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A