THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF PRIMARY EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASPE is a national body committed to the advancement of primary education through collaborative study and action. ASPE is open to all involved in primary education and aims to promote: independent and informed commentary of major issues; professional collaboration; independent research and reflection; enhancement of practice; dissemination of information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 March 2002: Standard registration
- ASPE (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF PRIMARY EDUCATION, INCORPORATING THE PRIMARY SCHOOL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Gary Beauchamp PhD | Chair | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nova Scott | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Joyce-Gibbons | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Gear B.A | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Malone BA MA PhD | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Murray BEd, MEd | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL ADAMS | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LATHAM | Trustee | 12 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
ROY HUGHES BA MSc | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.25k | £55.23k | £68.51k | £87.82k | £85.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.93k | £37.84k | £47.29k | £46.95k | £52.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2011 as amended on 19 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF PRIMARY EDUCATION THROUGH: A) PROMOTING AND FOSTERING THE DEVELOPMENT OF INFORMED AND REFLECTIVE STUDY OF PRIMARY EDUCATION, INCLUDING PRE- SCHOOL AS WELL AS THE LEGALLY DESIGNATED PRIMARY PHASE. MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE UK. B) BRINGING TOGETHER AND PROMOTING COLLABORATION WITHIN AND BETWEEN THE VARIOUS CONSTITUENCIES INVOLVED IN PRIMARY EDUCATION, FROM ALL PARTS OF THE UK. C) HOLDING SUCH COURSES AND CONFERENCES FOR THOSE CONCERNED WITH PRIMARY EDUCATION . D) PROVIDING INFORMED AND INDEPENDENT INFORMATION AND COMMENTARY ON POLICY ISSUES. E) ENCOURAGING A BROAD VIEW OF THE FORMS AND METHODS WHICH THOSE STUDYING PRIMARY EDUCATION MIGHT ADOPT , THE PRACTICES AND ISSUES ON WHICH THEY MIGHT FOCUS, AND THE INSTITUTIONAL CONTEXTS IN WHICH SUCH STUDY MIGHT BE PURSUED. F) PUBLISHING MATERIALS SUITABLE FOR PROMOTING THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 22
30 Princess Street
MANCHESTER
M1 4DA
- Phone:
- 07772483984
- Email:
- info@aspe.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window