THE CLINICAL SCIENCE AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Clinical Science and Education Foundation is a UK registered charity based at St. Bartholomew's Hospital, London. The charity provides specialist aid and expertise to selected individuals and institutions mainly in central Europe, particularly Romania. In recent years the charity has focused on the needs of children with hearing difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bulgaria
- Hungary
- Romania
Governance
- CSEF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.96k | £22.53k | £12.33k | £24.33k | £9.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.47k | £28.57k | £32.87k | £34.36k | £22.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 23 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 07 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/07/2012
Charitable objects
4.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO ARE IN NEED; 4.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND OTHER HEALTH WORKERS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 4.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window