Governing document THE ROALD DAHL MUSEUM AND STORY CENTRE
Charity number: 1085853

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2017 as amended on 28 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF LITERATURE AND CREATIVITY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND LITERATURE CENTRE BASED ON THE WORKS OF ROALD DAHL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.