Accounts and annual returns METHODIST OF THE DIASPORA

Charity number: 1094387
Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Annual return 03 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Annual return 03 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Annual return 03 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days
Annual return 03 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days