Financial history THE CHILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £76 £100.04k £50.02k £35.12k £323
Total expenditure £1.08k £76.06k £51.15k £52.20k £764
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A