THE CHILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes donations following a direct approach to the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON TERESA WARNOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nadine Chilton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAME DAVID CHILTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76 | £100.04k | £50.02k | £35.12k | £323 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £76.06k | £51.15k | £52.20k | £764 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MARCH 2001.
Charitable objects
1. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR OR TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR INFIRMITY, WHETHER IN OR OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT; 2. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR OR TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, WHETHER IN OR OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT; 3. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR OR TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, WHETHER IN OR OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT; 4. SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE COMMUNITY OR PERMITTED BY STATUTE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT; 5. SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OR PERMITTED BY STATUTE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT, PROVIDED THAT SUCH PURPOSES WOULD BE CHARITABLE IF CARRIED OUT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stepstile Meadow
Flanchford Road
Reigate
RH2 8QZ
- Phone:
- 07949184489
- Email:
- sharontwarnock@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window