STARS ORGANISATION SUPPORTING CEREBRAL PALSY S.O.S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 2003: Standard registration
- 15 June 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 June 2006: Funds transferred to 1103090 STARS FOUNDATION FOR CEREBRAL PALSY
- SOS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 14 December 2004 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 14 December 2004 | 14 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 30 MAY 2003 , 12 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 8 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED ADULT WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED AS CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENTS OF CALNE, GOATACRE, DERRY HILL, SANDY LANE AND CHERHILL TO ALLEVIATE THEIR ISOLATION AND MEET THEIR SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 06 May 2003 : Standard registration
- 15 June 2006 : Removed
- 15 June 2006 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window