Accounts and annual returns DEBDEN PARK HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1090920
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 October 2024 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 October 2024 611 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 October 2024 976 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 October 2024 1341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required