Financial history PUDDLEDUCKS NURSERY & PRE-SCHOOL (PEWSEY)

Charity number: 1088302
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £35.07k £70.99k £71.67k £144.47k £181.07k
Total expenditure £40.65k £66.44k £53.26k £139.80k £161.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A