Financial history ELMFIELD SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1090081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.45k £80 £608 £2.81k £305
Total expenditure £7.24k £15 £231 £204 £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A