8TH NORWICH (NORWICH SCHOOL) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting (Ages 5 - 18)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

22 Trustee(s)
127 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FRANK POND | Chair | 15 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Tim Chalk | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Manley | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Gent | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Court | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brown | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Flora White | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzy O'Connor | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Pond | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jing Song | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Clark | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anja Carter | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gardner | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tim Ball | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kilbourn | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Sturdee | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIM BROOK | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hayward | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNELISE SAVILL | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN POUNDER | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.96k | £99.67k | £153.07k | £189.83k | £179.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.06k | £88.42k | £159.86k | £149.79k | £152.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.99k | £44.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORWICH SCHOOL
69-71A THE CLOSE
NORWICH
NR1 4DD
- Phone:
- 01603 728430
- Email:
- gsl@8nss.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window