Financial history EAST OF LONDON FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1094419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.76k £17.74k £19.03k £18.80k £17.49k
Total expenditure £20.29k £17.35k £24.53k £17.41k £16.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A