Financial history PLAYSHACK PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1086808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £48.04k £53.18k £42.04k £44.23k £45.84k
Total expenditure £31.24k £28.26k £33.45k £37.44k £38.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A