PLAYSHACK PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1086808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a community based playgroup , our aim is to provide and promote the development of education to the under 5's and also to provide the opportunity for parents and carers to become involved in their childs education at an affordable rate. The nursery is open to all members of the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £45,835
Total expenditure: £38,231

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN TERESA JOHNSON Trustee
None on record
TERESA PRESTON Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE ANN DEFALCO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £48.04k £53.18k £42.04k £44.23k £45.84k
Total expenditure £31.24k £28.26k £33.45k £37.44k £38.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PLAYSHACK PLAYGROUP
LAVENDER HOUSE
ROTHERHITHE STREET
ROTHERHITHE
LONDON
SE16 6EA
Phone:
02072372166
Website:

No information available