THE CARSHALTON WATER TOWER AND HISTORIC GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit and education of the general public, the maintenance, restoration and preservation of the listed 18th century Water Tower, Hermitage, the Folly Bridge, Lodge and lake with its surrounding area at Carshalton House Estate, Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sutton
Governance
- 23 April 2001: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CARSHALTON WATER TOWER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK CHANNON YEO | Chair |
|
||||||
Anthony Robert Thorpe | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Ball | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA HEATHER GERTZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN SHEPLEY THORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WARIN RAVENSCROFT SYMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE ROBERT ORTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN CAROLE KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.61k | £47.29k | £37.09k | £40.06k | £75.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.79k | £87.25k | £42.81k | £21.18k | £52.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE MAINTENANCE, RESTORATION, REPAIR AND PRESERVATION OF THE WATER TOWER, THE HERMITAGE, THE LODGE, THE FOLLY BRIDGE, THE LAKE AND THE SURROUNDING GROUNDS AT CARSHALTON HOUSE, CARSHALTON, SURREY AS FEATURES OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR OTHER RPUBLIC INTEREST; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE HERITAGE PROPERTY; AND 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CARSHALTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 GROSVENOR AVENUE
CARSHALTON
SM5 3EN
- Phone:
- 02086691546
- Email:
- irvineknight@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window