Haberdashers' Monmouth School Friends

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF MONMOUTH SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE SCHOOL') BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 10 April 2001: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 March 2012: Re-registered
- 06 October 2023: Funds received from 1104054 FRIENDS OF HMSG
- HMS FRIENDS (Working name)
- FOMS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF MONMOUTH SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jem Jenkins-Jones | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rees | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michele Battrick | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Edwards | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Allman | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Dorman | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Myers MBE | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £2.19k | £4.77k | £4.96k | £11.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £1.97k | £9.93k | £5.82k | £3.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 August 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE HABERDASHERS’ MONMOUTH SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE SCHOOL') BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) ENCOURAGE CO-OPERATION, COMMUNICATION AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PARENTS, STAFF AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, PROVIDING CONTINUITY FROM YEAR TO YEAR. (B) STRENGTHEN LINKS BETWEEN THE SCHOOL AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. (C) ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY HELP. (D) PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING ACTIVITIES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE. (E) ASSIST THE SCHOOL BY RAISING FUNDS AND INVITING AND RECEIVING CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION OR OTHERWISE, PROVIDED THAT THE ASSOCIATION SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR ITS PRIMARY CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE. FUNDS RAISED SHALL BE DEVOTED TO SUCH PURPOSES AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE APPROVE, IN CONSULTATION WITH THE HEADTEACHER, AND WITH THEIR APPROVAL, AGREE WOULD BENEFIT THE SCHOOL. (F) DO ALL OTHER SUCH THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF SUCH OBJECTIVES PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE HEADTEACHER OF THE SCHOOL AND STAFF SHALL HAVE ENTIRE RESPONSIBILITY AND JURISDICTION FOR THE ORGANISATION OF DISCIPLINE, CURRICULUM, AND TEACHING METHODS IN THE SCHOOL, AND THE ASSOCIATION WILL NOT BE CONCERNED WITH INDIVIDUAL PUPILS OR WITH MEMBERS OF STAFF AND THEIR TEACHING. (G) CREATE A SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND BUILDING STRONG RELATIONSHIPS WITH THE SCHOOL; A NETWORK WHICH ULTIMATELY SUPPORTS THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND LIFE EXPERIENCE OF ALL THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
MONMOUTH SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Reddings
Boughspring
CHEPSTOW
Gwent
NP16 7JJ
- Phone:
- 07904283246
- Email:
- rosie.j.edwards@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window