Financial history PENDEEN COMMUNITY HERITAGE

Charity number: 1087755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £712.67k £733.33k £629.47k £563.26k £699.77k
Total expenditure £840.36k £534.46k £597.98k £589.38k £672.31k
Income from government contracts £114.00k £76.00k £76.00k £75.00k N/A
Income from government grants £9.99k £46.41k £22.66k N/A £85.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £85.67k £449.36k £157.28k £48.57k £137.58k
Income - Other trading activities £21.59k £10.16k £24.80k £16.57k £14.78k
Income - Charitable activities £604.79k £273.79k £446.53k £496.50k £544.96k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £617 £26 £866 £1.62k £2.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £17.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £832.80k £530.46k £591.32k £584.38k £666.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.56k £4.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £233 £1.27k £542 £53
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.66k £0 £1.09k