Trustees PENDEEN COMMUNITY HERITAGE
Charity number: 1087755

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Hardy | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Warren | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Tomlinson | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin David Oldcorn | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maryann Elizabeth Soper | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barnabas Corn | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Morton Davies | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Swarbrooke | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ANATOLE CLINTON BAKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.