THE OCKASH 2000 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the development of and care for the young of the Parish (Ockbrook and Borrowash in Derbyshire)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 June 2003: Standard registration
- OCKASH TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl David Moore | Trustee | 03 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN BALL | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Steare | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
VAL BULMAN | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID LESLIE HARRISON | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.37k | £821 | £2.08k | £890 | £5.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £1.78k | £1.85k | £3.16k | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION HEALTH AND RECREATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO LIVE IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA KNOWN AS THE PARISH OF OCKBROOK AND BORROWASH IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF OCKBROOK AND BORROWASH IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Borrowfield
Borrowash
Derby
DE72 3LB
- Phone:
- 01332731178
- Email:
- Ockash.trust@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window