Governing document BASINGSTOKE- OLD BASING U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 9 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 14 Jul 2021 as amended on 26 Jul 2021 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN BASINGSTOKE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BASINGSTOKE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.