STOCK PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School for children aged 2 1/2 years old to school age offering morning sessions of 2 1/2 hours Monday - Friday during term time only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 11 April 2001: Standard registration
- 06 May 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 May 2009: Funds transferred to 1125535 STOCK PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.07k | £35.90k | £47.89k | £103.60k | £62.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.07k | £37.08k | £42.71k | £49.73k | £64.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 27 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 27 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 09 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 13 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 23 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 23 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
STOCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window