DORCHESTER BALLET AND DANCE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of dance classes to adults and children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 09 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN STUART SELBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Nan Sheaves | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheena May Bennett | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE COSGROVE | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Thorndale | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.28k | £60.28k | £63.18k | £93.90k | £76.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.60k | £53.84k | £51.78k | £78.87k | £74.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £265 | £19.54k | £29.81k | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JULY 2001 as amended on 28 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DANCING, MUSIC, CHOREOGRAPHY AND ALLIED ARTS IN THE COMMUNITY BY GIVING PERFORMANCES, AND TRAINING ANY PERSONS REGARDLESS OF THEIR ABILITY".
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 ROTHESAY ROAD
DORCHESTER
DT1 2DX
- Phone:
- 01305751501
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window